Algebra Den


[ Home ] [ My Account ] [ Contact ]
Arithmetic
Additive Identity
Associative Property
Averages
Brackets
Closure Property
Commutative Property
Conversion of Measurement Units
Cube Root
Decimal
Distributivity of Multiplication over Addition
Divisibility Principles
Equality
Exponents
Factors
Fractions
Fundamental Operations
H.C.F / G.C.D
Integers
L.C.M
Multiples
Multiplicative Identity
Multiplicative Inverse
Numbers
Percentages
Profit and Loss
Ratio and Proportion
Simple Interest
Square Root
Unitary Method
Algebra
Algebraic Equation
Algebraic Expression
Order Relation
Standard Identities & their applications
Transpose
Cartesian System
Linear Equations
Probability
Polynomials
Geometry
Circle
Curves
Angles
Define Line, Line Segment and Rays
Non-Collinear Points
Polygons and its Types
Rectangle
Rhombus
Square
Three dimensional object
Trapezium
Basic Geometrical Terms
Parallelogram
Triangle
Trigonometry
Trigonometry Ratios
Data-Handling
Arithmetic Mean
Graphs
Median
Mode
Range
Frequency Distribution Table
Home >> Distributivity of Multiplication over Addition >>

Distributivity of Multiplication over Addition

If I ask you to solve (5 X 13), you can easly calculate and say answer is 65
(method 1).

The above problem can also be solved :

(5 X 13) = 5 X ( 10 + 3 )

And further

5 X ( 10 + 3 ) = ( 5 X 10 ) + (5 X 3)

Solve R.H.S and we get

= 50 + 15

= 65 (method 2)

Now the answer in both method 1 and method 2 is same i.e 65.

  • Method 2 is referred to as “Distributivity of Multiplication over Addition”
  • Method 2 is normally used when the multiplication is complex like the following :

    Example 1 = Solve (25 X 52)
    Answer = By using property - Distributivity of Multiplication over Addition, we get
    = 25 X ( 50 + 2)
    = (25 X 50) + (25 X 2)
    = 1250 + 50
    = 1300


    Example 2 = Simply (332 X 48) + (332 X 52) with the help of Property - Distributivity of Multiplication over Addition
    Answer = (332 X 48) + (332 X 52)
    By using property - Distributivity of Multiplication over Addition, we get
    = 332 X ( 48 + 52)
    = 332 X 100
    = 33200
  • Terms & Conditions

    All rights reserved
    Subscribe
    &
    Study More Algebra Topics